THE SOLDIERS OF OXFORDSHIRE TRUST

Charity Number: 1145408
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The purpose of The Soldiers of Oxfordshire Trust is to collect, document, preserve, display and to provide greater access to the material and stories that convey the military life of Oxfordshire and its people through the museum and associated activities. By providing a home in a purpose built museum, SOFO operates a museum increasing public access to this material.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £126,384
Total expenditure: £413,168

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 November 2000: Standard registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • SOLDIERS OF OXFORDSHIRE (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David John Shouesmith BEd MBA Chair 20 April 2021
None on record
Brigadier Anthony Duncan Harking OBE Trustee 15 July 2024
None on record
Lynda Susan Atkins Trustee 07 December 2023
None on record
James Andrew Seddon Trustee 07 February 2023
None on record
Lt Col Retd Richard Hugh Belbin Trustee 07 February 2023
None on record
Mike Montagu Trustee 04 October 2022
None on record
Thomas George Johnstone Trustee 13 January 2022
CUTTHORPE VILLAGE CHARITY
Received: On time
Citizens Advice North East Derbyshire
Received: On time
Henry John Spilberg BA Trustee 27 October 2021
None on record
Heather Rosemary Carter Trustee 20 April 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £69.34k £206.42k £247.14k £116.85k £126.38k
Total expenditure £291.66k £259.36k £264.74k £299.36k £413.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £17.90k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 06 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 06 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 25 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 25 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 05 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 05 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 14 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 15 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 21/08/2000 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 26/07/2011
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC AND MEMBERS OF THE REGIMENTS IN THE MILITARY HISTORY OF OXFORDSHIRE AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC AND MEMBERS OF THE REGIMENTS IN THE REGIMENTS' HISTORY AND TO PROMOTE MILITARY EFFICIENCY
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Registration history
  • 13 November 2000 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
SOFO
Office
Harrisons Lane
WOODSTOCK
Oxfordshire
OX20 1SS
Phone:
01993810210