Financial history BURDETT BANGLADESHI CULTURAL ASSOCIATION (BBCA)

Charity number: 1148354
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £209.13k £295.60k £350.94k £358.54k £409.90k
Total expenditure £172.62k £221.31k £215.16k £247.57k £270.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.73k £683 N/A N/A N/A