SOUTH TOTTENHAM KEHILA LIMITED

Charity number: 1145657
Charity reporting is overdue by 154 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The company owns and maintains Crowland Road Synagogue and oversees all the various activities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 January 2023

Total income: £61,605
Total expenditure: £36,605

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Hackney
  • Haringey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 January 2012: Standard registration
  • 09 August 2014: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 07 October 2014: Re-registered
  • 09 August 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 16 November 2015: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MICHAEL BIBERFELD Chair 10 February 2017
FRIENDS OF CHORTKOV
Charity reporting is overdue by 550 days
Deborah Hager Trustee 10 August 2022
MERKAZ HATORAH LIMITED
Received: 180 days late
FRIENDS OF CHORTKOV
Charity reporting is overdue by 550 days

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023
Total gross income £41.83k £47.29k £52.29k £48.93k £61.61k
Total expenditure £85.80k £39.98k £46.71k £28.82k £36.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 154 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 154 days
Annual return 31 January 2023 04 August 2024 248 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 04 August 2024 248 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2022 20 June 2023 202 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 20 June 2023 202 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2021 10 January 2022 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 10 January 2022 41 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2020 12 November 2021 347 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 12 November 2021 347 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
South Tottenham Synagogue
111-113 Crowland Road
LONDON
N15 6UR
Phone:
02088800400
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available