STANSTED MOUNTFICHET UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide access to and funding for activities and educational groups for members of our association. Provide social activities for members of our association.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 12 July 2012: Standard registration
- STANSTED U3A (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pauline Green | Chair | 19 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Jonathan Samuel Hopewell | Trustee | 15 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carol Procter | Trustee | 15 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Philip Riley | Trustee | 20 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alison Garrard | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gaynor Mordcovich | Trustee | 16 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Oldman | Trustee | 16 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Sedgebeer | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Mary Bradbury | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.47k | £5.13k | £19.64k | £23.73k | £32.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.40k | £3.52k | £15.62k | £28.41k | £30.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24/08/2009 AS AMENDED ON 21/05/2015 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Crossways
Station Road
Elsenham
BISHOP'S STORTFORD
Hertfordshire
CM22 6LA
- Phone:
- 07881095898
- Email:
- stanstedu3a@gmail.com
- Website:
-
stansted.u3asite.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window