SERIOUS TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Serious Trust celebrates the potential of music to have a postive impact on lives. We instigate music-based learning and participation activities, professional development programmes for musicians and support the creation of new music. Our aims are achieved primarily by supporting (as a grant maker) Serious Events, highly respected producers of live jazz, international and contemporary music.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 January 2012: Standard registration
- SERIOUS TRUST (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joel Kibazo | Chair | 21 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Miranda Isobel Johnson | Trustee | 23 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Peter Latham | Trustee | 23 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rodrigo Amalfi Voss | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Froniga Lambert | Trustee | 24 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANNA FEUCHTWANG | Trustee | 24 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Vera Kwakofi | Trustee | 11 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £224.71k | £125.09k | £53.97k | £71.49k | £16.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £182.31k | £168.78k | £26.92k | £49.02k | £65.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2023
(These accounts |
29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15 DEC 2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 13/03/2012
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: (1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO PUBLIC APPRECIATION OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS FORMS, PROMOTING A KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING OF MUSIC AND FOSTERING THE PRACTICE OF MUSIC ARTISTS. (2) TO ADVANCE THE ARTS AND CULTURE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC, PARTICULARLY (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) BY PROMOTING AND FACILITATING ACCESS TO AND PERFORMANCES OF MUSIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Serious Ltd
Pill Box
Unit 503
115 Coventry Road
London
- Phone:
- 02073241880
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window