Financial history HASTINGS & ST. LEONARDS CHESS CLUB LTD

Charity number: 1151189
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £9.56k £17.87k £15.88k £11.46k £19.47k
Total expenditure £9.96k £15.64k £16.10k £7.35k £25.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.24k N/A N/A N/A