SUPPORT FOR THE SICK NEWBORN AND THEIR PARENTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support for sick newborns and their families at the Newborn Care Unit, John Radcliffe Hospital, Oxford
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 28 March 2012: Standard registration
- 01 May 2013: Funds received from 285231 THE SOCIETY FOR THE SUPPORT OF THE SICK NEWBORN AN...
- SSNAP (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KERRI JANE KNIBBS | Chair | 06 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
Mandeep Singh Tumber | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alan Sowden | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Laura Askew | Trustee | 17 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicky Broughton | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Drew McAllister Brown | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Amy Lamb | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nicholas Kevin Ives | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Luke Froude | Trustee | 15 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
PAUL VINCENT | Trustee | 18 December 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £259.53k | £243.99k | £390.01k | £328.21k | £323.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £294.84k | £176.67k | £287.16k | £335.60k | £371.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £3.14k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 29 December 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 29 December 2023 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/12/2011
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("OBJECTS") ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: (1) PROMOTING THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS OF BABIES WHO AT ANY TIME AFTER THEIR BIRTH WERE OR ARE TREATED IN THE NEO-NATAL UNIT OF THE JOHN RADCLIFFE HOSPITAL, OXFORD; AND (2) FURTHERING THE EDUCATION OF AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF RESEARCH BY PERSONS WHO ARE ASSOCIATED WITH THE JOHN RADCLIFFE HOSPITAL AT OXFORD ENGAGED IN THE MEDICAL NURSING OR OTHER CARE OF BABIES AND INFANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SSNAP
Level 2
The Women's Centre
John Radcliffe Hospital
Oxford
- Phone:
- 01865221359
- Email:
- ssnap@ouh.nhs.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window