MACCLESFIELD METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Care of 8 churches and assisting in their religious activities under the auspices of the Methodist Church of the United Kingdom
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

34 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cheshire East
Governance
- 17 January 2012: Previously excepted registration
- 14 March 2023: Funds received from 1152907 TRUSTEES OF HAZEL GROVE & POYNTON METHODIST CIRCUI...
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
34 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTINE JANE DING | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Barbara Christine Ogle | Trustee | 08 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alan Rashleigh | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elizabeth Mellor | Trustee | 23 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alexander John Price | Trustee | 17 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Heather Anne Cann | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Valerie Margaret Jones | Trustee | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Angela Bourne | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET JOAN HAWKYARD | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Rosalind Watson | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
David John Dippie | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Boden | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jean Drinkwater | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jane Wendy Robson | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Thomason Gunning | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Rosemary Edith Childs | Trustee | 20 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev GRAHAM EDWARDS | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOYCE MARGERY WILSON | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Edward Chandler Jones | Trustee | 16 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
MAVIS NIXON | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|||||
ELIZABETH HAMMOND | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Jane Claire Walker | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOAN GREEN | Trustee | 01 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
JILLIAN LONGSON MBE | Trustee | 07 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
BRENDA MARY CHAPMAN | Trustee | 07 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
Rev SHEILA MARY BISHOP | Trustee | 07 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET CHRISTINE PARKIN | Trustee | 07 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MICHAEL BIRD BSC | Trustee | 07 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
ALAN JOHN CHAPMAN | Trustee | 07 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ARTHUR BULLOCK BA | Trustee | 06 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOAN HELENA PRITCHARD MED | Trustee | 30 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
DONALD IAN WARDLE BA | Trustee | 26 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
RUTH LINDE | Trustee | 17 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
BRENDA BAILEY | Trustee | 01 September 2006 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £202.30k | £645.33k | £306.09k | £520.80k | £244.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £195.09k | £242.21k | £261.10k | £243.65k | £261.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £566.54k | N/A | £211.03k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £3.04k | N/A | £2.06k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £75.76k | N/A | £307.71k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £242.21k | N/A | £243.65k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £1.00k | N/A | £1.00k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) ADOPTED 20 SEP 1932
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDUARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Langley Methodist Church
Main Road
Langley
Macclesfield
Cheshire
SK11 0BU
- Phone:
- 07541069771
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window