WEST YORKSHIRE PRINT WORKSHOP LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide printmaking facilities for artists and courses for everyone from beginners to experienced artists. We also have a gallery/community space with a rolling calendar of exhibitions and we provide art workshops for children and young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £100,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
17 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Kirklees
Governance
- 07 June 2012: Standard registration
- 25 June 2012: Funds received from 1010125 WEST YORKSHIRE PRINT WORKSHOP
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hannah Kayi Mason | Chair | 10 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Liadin Cooke | Trustee | 05 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laura Alexandra Mateescu | Trustee | 25 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Mary Page | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Fleur Grace Ward | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julie Anne Turner | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rowan Stefane Bailey | Trustee | 09 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Thomas William Walter Ratcliffe | Trustee | 03 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £156.76k | £195.94k | £157.36k | £153.59k | £208.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £148.22k | £156.87k | £192.05k | £164.62k | £208.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £54.69k | £64.37k | N/A | £100.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04/11/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/03/2012 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 08/05/2012
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION BY THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS AND PROVIDING A CENTRE FOR PRINTMAKING AND ASSOCIATED ARTISTIC DISCIPLINES
Contact information
- Address:
-
West Yorkshire Print Workshop
75a Huddersfield Road
Mirfield
WF14 8AT
- Phone:
- 01924497646
- Email:
- info@wypw.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window