THE YORK BRIDGE CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's activities are focused on the (a) the advancement of amateur sport by promoting the game of bridge for the benefit of the residents of York and the surrounding area. (b) the provision of facilities for the learning, teaching and playing of bridge for the benefit of the residents of York and the surrounding area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- City Of York
Governance
- 08 March 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sally Gregory | Chair | 04 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Latham | Trustee | 30 July 2024 | ||||||
Michael Langton Waller | Trustee | 30 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Judy Baines | Trustee | 30 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip Priestly Ashton | Trustee | 30 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Azizah Saidah Clayton | Trustee | 04 August 2020 |
|
|||||
PHILIP JAMES GODFREY | Trustee | 30 January 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.43k | £141.28k | £64.23k | £83.46k | £63.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.00k | £12.12k | £32.20k | £29.50k | £33.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £21.27k | £8.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17 JAN 2012 as amended on 21 Oct 2024
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("OBJECTS") ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: (A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF AMATEUR SPORT BY PROMOTING THE GAME OF BRIDGE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF YORK AND THE SURROUNDING AREA. (B) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE LEARNING, TEACHING AND PLAYING OF BRIDGE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF YORK AND THE SURROUNDING AREA WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
York Bridge Club
The Green
Acomb
York
England
YO26 5FG
- Phone:
- 01904488357
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window