Financial history TYNESIDE CINEMA

Charity number: 502592
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £4.92m £2.28m £3.91m £2.80m £4.27m
Total expenditure £5.31m £2.98m £3.49m £4.02m £5.48m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £37.82k £45.11k £119.70k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £872.98k £1.16m £2.07m £405.77k £425.95k
Income - Other trading activities £2.00m £5.50k £647.86k £1.08m £1.58m
Income - Charitable activities £2.05m £376.73k £792.58k £1.31m £2.26m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £83 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £742.22k £399.35k £9.26k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.63m £1.98m £2.24m £2.29m £3.70m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.69m £990.79k £1.26m £1.74m £1.77m
Expenditure - Governance £48.09k £256.40k £87.29k £0 £46.02k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0