THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST GILES' EXHALL COVENTRY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Parish Church with supporting activities for all age groups within the community, both within the church itself and both Chuch Halls. Fuller details given in original charity application.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £5,285 from 1 government grant(s)
People

17 Trustee(s)
32 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 13 March 2012: Previously excepted registration
- EXHALL PCC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Gail Ann Phillip | Chair | 12 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Neva Humaira Khan | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|||||
CAROL GOUGH | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brian Raymond Inott | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Marie Smith | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Williams | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Anthony Lanchbury | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Barnes | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anna Standing | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Eduardo Antonio Lanteri | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roy Martin Edwards | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Mark Jones | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Neil Charles Harris | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Ruth Anderson | Trustee | 07 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gwyneth Angharad Carter | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Vivien Hopkins | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
John William Owen | Trustee | 08 February 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £253.78k | £89.90k | £95.49k | £109.62k | £109.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £159.56k | £118.68k | £117.99k | £137.64k | £167.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.35k | £4.54k | N/A | £2.00k | £5.29k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02/01/1956
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHURCH HALL
ST. GILES ROAD
COVENTRY
CV7 9GZ
- Phone:
- 02476368008
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window