THE DOUGLAS HAIG FELLOWSHIP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Douglas Haig Fellowship encourages academic study of Field Marshal Earl Haig of Bemersyde and the armies he commanded in the Great War 1914-18. Each year it publishes a scholarly publication, makes an award to a post graduate student, appoints a Haig Fellow and holds two luncheon meetings. The Fellowship also fulfils a Commemorative Object, keeping a watching brief on statues & memorials.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 February 2013: Standard registration
- 03 December 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 03 December 2018: Funds transferred to 219279 THE ROYAL BRITISH LEGION
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.41k | £5.54k | £5.22k | £5.78k | £4.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.59k | £4.19k | £4.39k | £5.24k | £4.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 20 November 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 29 March 2018 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 11 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 10 March 2016 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 JAN 1995 AS AMENDED ON 25/01/2013
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE GOOD CITIZENSHIP AMONGST THE PUBLIC AND TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY OF THE ARMED FORCES OF THE CROWN BY PROVIDING AND MAINTAINING PUBLIC MEMORIALS TO COMMEMORATE AND REMEMBER THE LIFE OF DOUGLAS HAIG (1861 - 1928), FIELD MARSHAL EARL HAIG OF BEMERSYDE ('THE FIELD MARSHAL), THE FORCES HE COMMANDED AND THOSE WHO LOST THEIR LIVES OR SUFFERED INJURY, OR PUT THEMSELVES AT RISK OF LOSS OF LIFE OR INJURY, IN SERVICE OF THE PUBLIC. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE LIFE OF THE FIELD MARSHAL, HIS ACHIEVEMENTS, THOSE OF THE FORCES HE COMMANDED AND THE CONTINUING MILITARY LESSONS OF THEIR LEGACY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PURSUIT OF OBJECTIVE STUDY IN THE FOLLOWING AREAS: THE CONTRIBUTION OF THE FIELD-MARSHAL TO MILITARY REFORM; HIS GENERALSHIP AND THAT OF HIS SUBORDINATE COMMANDERS; THE COMMAND AND CONTROL OF THE BRITISH ARMY DURING THE FIRST WORLD WAR; THE FORM AND WORKING OF THE RELATIONSHIP BETWEEN THE POLITICAL SUPREME COMMAND AND MILITARY COMMANDERS; THE CONDUCT OF COALITION OPERATIONS; THE PRINCIPLES AND APPLICATION OF MILITARY DOCTRINE GENERALLY; THE EFFICIENCY OF MILITARY MEDICINE AND MEDICAL SERVICES; AND THE PUBLIC DUTY OF CARE FOR VETERANS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window