Financial history REGAL TENBURY TRUST LIMITED

Charity Number: 1148555
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £283.28k £215.63k £475.46k £340.72k £631.10k
Total expenditure £282.75k £168.62k £413.50k £498.98k £536.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £32.41k £171.99k £41.46k £2.50k £27.38k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £171.62k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £457.58k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.90k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £100.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £536.93k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0