Trustees LANCASTER BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1146765
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev EMILIAN CIRTINA Chair 01 April 2012
LANCASTER BAPTIST CHURCH
Recently registered
JAMES ROBERT ELLERSHAW Trustee 14 July 2024
LANCASTER BAPTIST CHURCH
Recently registered
Peter Martin JONES Trustee 16 July 2023
LANCASTER BAPTIST CHURCH
Recently registered
STEPHEN JOHN ELLIOTT Trustee 17 July 2022
LANCASTER BAPTIST CHURCH
Recently registered
Ellen Christine CUTHBERTSON Trustee 17 July 2022
LANCASTER BAPTIST CHURCH
Recently registered
Ibukunolu David BABARINDE Trustee 17 July 2022
LANCASTER BAPTIST CHURCH
Recently registered
DANIEL JAMES CHURM Trustee 22 July 2021
LANCASTER BAPTIST CHURCH
Recently registered
MARTIN ALEXANDER WOOLVEN Trustee 22 July 2021
LANCASTER BAPTIST CHURCH
Recently registered
KIRSTIE JEAN BANKS-LYON Trustee 07 July 2019
NORTH WESTERN BAPTIST ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
LANCASTER BAPTIST CHURCH
Recently registered
KEVIN HENDERSON Trustee 07 July 2019
LANCASTER BAPTIST CHURCH
Recently registered
STEPHEN DAVID GREEN Trustee 01 April 2012
LANCASTER BAPTIST CHURCH
Recently registered