FIRWOOD AND DISTRICT RESIDENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A 'Good Neighbours' Scheme for the elderly. Community activities for the Christmas Lights Switch On, a Christmas Market and Chadderton Family Fun Day. A community allotment and woodland project to provide a wildlife space with walks, children's play space, pond dipping facilities, raised beds for cultivation of flowers and vegetables run by the local Brownie Group.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 25 September 2023
Total income includes £10,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Oldham
Governance
- 12 July 2013: Standard registration
- FADRA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANET ANN MCLAREN | Trustee | 15 June 2020 |
|
|||||
Graham Taylor | Trustee | 15 June 2020 |
|
|||||
Margaret Hughes | Trustee | 15 June 2020 |
|
|||||
JO BRADBURN | Trustee | 19 February 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 25/09/2019 | 25/09/2020 | 25/09/2021 | 25/09/2022 | 25/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.95k | £4.74k | £14.97k | £10.70k | £11.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.17k | £3.01k | £1.24k | £21.19k | £4.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £998 | £9.75k | £10.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 25 September 2023 | 15 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 25 September 2022 | 06 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 25 September 2021 | 11 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 25 September 2020 | 18 October 2021 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 25 September 2019 | 12 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 SEP 2008 AS AMENDED ON 26/09/2012
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF FIRWOOD AND DISTRICT AND THE WHOLE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 Baytree Avenue
Chadderton
Oldham
OL9 0NH
- Phone:
- 01612842275
- Website:
-
firwoodresidents.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window