The Auckland Project

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Running the Castle: managing the Castle, gardens and parkland - opening to the public. Enhancing the Castle: interpreting existing rooms and paintings, creating new temporary exhibitions,turning the Castle, medieval walled garden and historic parkland into a major heritage attraction, together with Market Place art gallery Creating social impact: jobs, apprentices, volunteers, creative projects
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£14,076,919
Donations and legacies | £9.57m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £2.72m | |
Investments | £919.14k | |
Other | £867.24k |
Total expenditure:
£13,700,629
Raising funds | £183.12k | |
Charitable activities | £9.57m | |
Other | £3.95m |
-£62,500 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £4.13m | |
Charitable expenditure | £9.57m | |
Retained for future use | £376.29k |
People

137 Employee(s)
5 Trustee(s)
468 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
£90k to £100k | 2 |
£140k to £150k | 1 |
£150k to £200k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Durham
Governance
- 02 March 2012: Standard registration
- THE AUCKLAND CASTLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Elizabeth Bonnar Dean | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Nicholas Roderick Holtam | Trustee | 26 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Robert John Yorke | Trustee | 26 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Brendan Godfrey Eamonn Finucane | Trustee | 26 October 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Anna Marie Lynch | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.99m | £11.29m | £6.59m | £7.76m | £14.08m | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.30m | £8.00m | £8.24m | £11.80m | £13.70m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £9.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £16.58m | £10.45m | £5.40m | £5.22m | £9.57m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £319.40k | £100.25k | £190.93k | £1.52m | £2.72m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £536.70k | £299.08k | £320.36k | £672.24k | £919.14k | |
|
Income - Other | £552.59k | £446.76k | £678.52k | £344.35k | £867.24k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £9.55m | £7.13m | £6.61m | £8.69m | £9.57m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £745.11k | £142.64k | £120.87k | £150.13k | £183.12k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £34.08k | £26.13k | £35.72k | £60.31k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £724.76k | £1.52m | £2.96m | £3.95m |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £50.54m | £57.30m | £60.56m | £63.99m | £66.88m | |
|
Long-term investments | £1.52m | £1.52m | £1.51m | £1.51m | £2.29m | |
|
Other assets | £35.29m | £31.78m | £27.14m | £19.86m | £16.61m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.63m | £1.59m | £1.86m | £2.06m | £2.16m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 February 2023 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 February 2023 | 28 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01 FEB 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 06 OCT 2015 as amended on 29 Oct 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE THE BENEFITS OR FURTHERANCE OF SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OR CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN SUCH MANNER AND (IF MORE THAN ONE) IN SUCH SHARES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE AND, IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, TO OR TOWARDS OR FOR ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING CHARITABLE PURPOSES: 1.1 TO PRESERVE PROTECT AND IMPROVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY AND THE INHABITANTS OF THE CHARITY'S AREA IN PARTICULAR THE CASTLE AND OTHER BUILDINGS OF NATIONAL ARCHITECTURAL HISTORIC OR ARTISTIC INTEREST WITHIN THE CHARITY'S AREA TO PROMOTE ACCESS THERETO AND ENJOYMENT THEREOF BY THE PUBLIC AND TO AUGMENT THE AMENITIES OF THE CASTLE AND SUCH OTHER BUILDINGS AND THEIR SURROUNDINGS; 1.2 TO PRESERVE, PROTECT, MAINTAIN AND IMPROVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY AND THE INHABITANTS OF THE CHARITY'S AREA IN PARTICULAR THE FURNITURE, PICTURES, HISTORICAL RECORDS, BOOKS, MANUSCRIPT, MONUMENTS, ARMOUR, PORCELAIN, SILVER AND GOLD OBJECTS, OBJETS D'ART AND OTHER CHATTELS ASSOCIATED WITH OR DISPLAYED OR KEPT IN THE CASTLE OR IN ANY BUILDING WITHIN THE CHARITY'S AREA AND TO PROMOTE ACCESS TO AND ENJOYMENT OF SUCH CHATTELS BY THE PUBLIC; 1.3 TO PROMOTE PUBLIC ACCESS TO THE COUNTRYSIDE WITHIN THE CHARITY'S AREA, THE PROVISION OF ROUTES AND WAYS THEREFORE, AND THE PRESERVATION OF FOOTPATHS, COMMONS AND WASTELANDS; 1.4 TO INCREASE KNOWLEDGE, UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF MATTERS OF HISTORIC, ARTISTIC, ARCHITECTURAL, CULTURAL OR AESTHETIC INTEREST INCLUDING THOSE CONCERNING THE LANDS AND OTHER PROPERTY COMPRISED IN THE CHARITY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC; 1.5 TO CONSERVE ANIMAL, BIRD AND PLANT WILDLIFE WITHIN THE CHARITY'S AREA FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC; 1.6 TO IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN AGRICULTURE, HORTICULTURE, APICULTURE, FORESTRY AND ALLIED OCCUPATIONS WITHIN THE CHARITY'S AREA; 1.7 TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC PARTICULARLY WITHIN, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE CHARITY'S AREA BY: 1.7.1 THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF RESOURCES; AND 1.7.2 THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION; 1.8 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN SUBJECTS RELATING TO SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT, THE USE OF RENEWABLE ENERGY SOURCES AND THE PROTECTION, ENHANCEMENT AND REHABILITATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND TO PROMOTE STUDY AND RESEARCH IN SUCH SUBJECTS PROVIDED THAT THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH STUDY ARE DISSEMINATED TO THE PUBLIC AT LARGE; 1.9 THE ADVANCEMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL IMPROVEMENT THROUGH THE PROMOTION OF THE USE OF RENEWABLE ENERGY SOURCES; 1.10 THE PROMOTION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF URBAN OR RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION WITHIN THE CHARITY'S AREA BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: 1.10.1 THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; 1.10.2 THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE IN ORDER TO PROVIDE OPPORTUNITIES FOR PEOPLE IN CASES OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER CHARITABLE NEED; 1.10.3 THE CREATION OF TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES; 1.10.4 THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO SUCH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND PROJECTS AS APPROPRIATE; AND/OR 1.10.5 THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL OR TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE TO ORGANISATIONS AND INDIVIDUALS WISHING TO DEVELOP ENTREPRENEURIAL AND OTHER SKILLS AND/OR PROVIDE OPPORTUNITIES FOR OTHERS; AND 1.11 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN HISTORY AND/OR THE ARTS BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF MUSEUMS AND/OR GALLERIES; PROVIDED ALWAYS THAT NOTHING IN THESE ARTICLES SHALL AUTHORISE OR PERMIT THE CHARITY'S FUNDS TO BE PAID OR APPLIED AT ANY TIME OR IN ANY CIRCUMSTANCES FOR ANY PURPOSE OR IN ANY MANNER WHICH IS NOT EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
58 Kingsway
BISHOP AUCKLAND
County Durham
DL14 7JF
- Phone:
- 01388743750
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window