THE LESLIE SPORTS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing sports facilities to the local and wider community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £182,880 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kirklees
Governance
- 10 September 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CRAIG LESLIE ANDREW | Chair | 28 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOHN LEE HENTON | Trustee | 28 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
PAUL RICHARD JOYCE | Trustee | 28 February 2012 |
|
|||||
GRAHAM ANDREW LESLIE | Trustee | 28 February 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.77k | £96.67k | £63.90k | £195.37k | £241.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £74.83k | £61.24k | £92.28k | £116.02k | £177.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £45.08k | £18.12k | £153.06k | £182.88k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 March 2021 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 March 2021 | 53 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17 FEB 2012
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY AND, IN PARTICULAR, THOSE LIVING AND WORKING WITHIN A TWENTY MILE RADIUS OF SHELLEY, HUDDERSFIELD, WEST YORKSHIRE, AND WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING: (1) TO PROMOTE THE HEALTH OF THE COMMUNITY BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING FOOTBALL AND OTHER HEALTHY SPORTS; (2) TO RELIEVE POVERTY, OLD AGE, DISABLEMENT AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION WITHIN THE COMMUNITY; (3) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, INCLUDING SOCIAL, PHYSICAL AND VOCATIONAL TRAINING, THE PROVISION OF TRAINING FOR UNEMPLOYED PERSONS AND ADULT EDUCATION WITHIN THE COMMUNITY; (4) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION FOR THOSE WITHIN THE COMMUNITY WHO HAVE SPECIAL NEEDS OF SUCH FACILITIES; (5) TO PROMOTE GOOD CITIZENSHIP WITHIN THE COMMUNITY; AND (6) TO PROMOTE HARMONY BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT ETHNIC AND CULTURAL BACKGROUNDS WITHIN THE COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 1B
Denby Dale Industrial Park
Wakefield Road
Denby Dale
HUDDERSFIELD
HD8 8QH
- Phone:
- 0161 832 5614
- Email:
- verity@lesliecountryinns.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window