THE LETTERING & COMMEMORATIVE ARTS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We encourage the UK's tradition of lettercarving to flourish through our Apprenticeship Scheme, Lettercarving Workshops, regular exhibitions, the Art & Memory Collection and illustrated publications. We also help and advise people with the commissioning of unique memorials and other lettered works,
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 20 August 2012: Standard registration
- 10 November 2023: Funds received from 1071427 THE MEMORIAL ARTS CHARITY
- Memorial Arts Charity (Working name)
- MEMORIALS BY ARTISTS (Working name)
- The Lettering Arts Trust (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Nicholas Heath | Chair | 22 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Rev Robyn Caroline Golden-Hann | Trustee | 03 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jamie Timothy Bill | Trustee | 03 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Teucer Wilson | Trustee | 10 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karoline Newman | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Elisabeth Ashbridge | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ronald Carl Clarke | Trustee | 03 February 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £203.13k | £115.39k | £218.78k | £172.85k | £125.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £201.83k | £148.55k | £171.70k | £159.27k | £91.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £37.80k | £19.23k | £2.08k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 January 2023 | 73 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03 FEB 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16/08/2012
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS AND CRAFTS ASSOCIATED WITH THE UK'S LETTERING TRADITION, PARTICULARLY CONCERNING LETTERING FOR MEMORIALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
LETTERING ARTS TRUST
50 Princes Street
Ipswich
Suffolk
IP1 1RJ
- Phone:
- 01728688393
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window