VELMORE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The company's objectives and activities are to work with the Velmore Church and the local community to open and operate the newly developed community building. The Building is run as a Community Centre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £22,151 from 3 government contract(s) and £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
- Southampton City
Governance
- 03 May 2012: Standard registration
- 13 March 2023: Funds received from 1191665 CHANDLER'S FORD HELP
- VELMORE CENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GUY RIDDOCH | Chair | 29 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Sharon Grinter | Trustee | 14 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Teresa Rosalie Martin | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
LINDA ROSS | Trustee | 08 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
KATHLEEN HATCHETT | Trustee | 01 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW JOHN WATT | Trustee | 29 March 2012 |
|
|||||
ROBERT ANTHONY DIBB | Trustee | 29 March 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £72.89k | £61.00k | £57.31k | £80.35k | £86.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £65.29k | £53.75k | £49.04k | £71.51k | £74.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £20.12k | £22.15k | |
|
Income from government grants | £750 | £46.73k | £11.62k | £3.19k | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19/12/2011
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY("THE OBJECTS")ARE TO: 3.1 PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; 3.2 ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF, A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS; 3.3 TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED.THE CHARITY SHALL BE NON-PARTY IN POLITICS AND NON-SECTARIAN IN RELIGION. THE AREA OF BENEFIT SHALL BE VELMORE ESTATE AND NORTH END COPSE IN THE BOROUGH OF EASTLEIGH. THIS AREA IS BOUNDED BY LEIGH ROAD, BOURNEMOUTH ROAD, CHESTNUT AVENUE AND THE M3.
Area of benefit
VELMORE ESTATE AND NORTH END COPSE IN THE BOROUGH OF EASTLEIGH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Velmore Community Association
Falkland Road
Chandlers Ford
Eastleigh
Hampshire
SO53 3GY
- Phone:
- 02380261139
- Website:
-
velmorecentre.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window