THE HINGE CENTRE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A charity with a community centre based in Bridlington. Offering services such as benefits and welfare guidance, resettlement support, community activities and groups for adults, life skills, community food store, emergency food parcels and activities and events for children, young people and the wider local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £30,322 from 5 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neil Watson | Chair | 14 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alex Shepherd | Trustee | 18 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Garnett | Trustee | 04 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Evison | Trustee | 02 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Linda Christian | Trustee | 04 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £267.99k | £310.34k | £359.86k | £418.99k | £438.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £272.83k | £250.12k | £284.39k | £321.67k | £393.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £54.18k | £27.77k | £30.32k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 14 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19/02/2008 AS AMENDED ON 12 JUL 2021 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 09 FEB 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE TOWN OF BRIDLINGTON IN THE EAST RIDING OF YORKSHIRE, AND ITS ENVIRONS, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH, TO RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND THE DISTRESS ARISING THERE FROM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Crown Community Centre
Quay Road
Bridlington
YO16 4HY
- Phone:
- 01262679671
- Email:
- jo@thehinge.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window