THE FRIENDS OF ALDINGBOURNE, BARNHAM AND EASTERGATE CHURCHES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintenance and upkeep of 3 listed churches
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- West Sussex
Governance
- 10 April 2012: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF ABE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEVEN RICHARD MAPLE | Chair | 09 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
JULIAN WILLIAM GORDON BUXTON | Trustee | 31 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Paul Richard Armstead | Trustee | 31 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Sarah Tripp | Trustee | 27 April 2021 |
|
|||||
LESLEY BRYANT | Trustee | 27 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Bradley Francis Smith | Trustee | 27 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mary Camerer Cuss | Trustee | 27 April 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.98k | £3.30k | £46.02k | £19.92k | £10.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.43k | £4.19k | £1.19k | £5.13k | £5.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 03 APR 2012
Charitable objects
(A) TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE CHURCHES SITUATED IN THE VILLAGES OF ALDINGBOURNE, BARNHAM AND EASTERGATE, THE CHURCH BUILDINGS' MONUMENTS, FIXTURES, FITTINGS, FURNITURE, STAINED GLASS, ORNAMENTS, ORGAN AND OTHER CHATTELS AND TO ASSIST THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL IN THE FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; (B) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
35 Barnham Road
Barnham
BOGNOR REGIS
West Sussex
PO22 0ER
- Phone:
- 07720046277
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window