Financial history THE ST CHAD'S CENTRE TRUST COMPANY

Charity number: 1148234
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £27.46k £23.13k £28.74k £20.00k £24.46k
Total expenditure £19.68k £16.58k £31.23k £18.47k £30.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.67k £11.63k N/A N/A