Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARK KENNINGTON

Charity number: 1147434
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £247.78k £427.62k £428.60k £365.34k £338.88k
Total expenditure £220.65k £340.51k £374.25k £389.92k £425.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £15.00k N/A