THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARK KENNINGTON

Charity Number: 1147434
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

? Regular public worship open to all. ? Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and the bereaved. ? Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups ? Promoting the whole mission of the Church through provision of activities for senior citizens, parents and toddlers and other special need groups. ? Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £338,882
Total expenditure: £425,245

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Lambeth

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 May 2012: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • ST MARK'S PCC, KENNINGTON (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev STEPHEN HUGH COULSON Chair 14 May 2012
LAMBETH STREET PASTORS
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST STEPHEN'S CHURCH, SOUTH LAMBETH
Received: On time
THE ST STEPHEN'S CHARITY
Received: On time
Dr Emma Webb Trustee 12 February 2025
None on record
Rita Edmond Trustee 26 May 2024
None on record
Olivette Barry Trustee 26 May 2024
None on record
Iain Lunt Trustee 26 May 2024
None on record
David Amaefula Trustee 26 May 2024
None on record
Rev Alex Mutyaba Trustee 24 June 2023
None on record
Caroline Levitt Trustee 23 May 2023
None on record
Jane Basa Namurye Trustee 14 May 2023
LI TIM OI FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Audley Clarke Trustee 14 May 2023
None on record
Girish Daby Trustee 14 May 2023
None on record
David Thomas Trustee 06 December 2020
None on record
Sebastian Fenton Trustee 06 December 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £247.78k £427.62k £428.60k £365.34k £338.88k
Total expenditure £220.65k £340.51k £374.25k £389.92k £425.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £15.00k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 14 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 14 May 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 03 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 03 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 09 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 09 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 21 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
337 Kennington Park Road
Kennington
London
SE11 4PW
Phone:
02075827029