THE BRIDPORT LITERARY FESTIVAL LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Bridport Literary Festival Limited organise an annual Literary Festival in Bridport, Dorset. The Festival runs for one week in November each year. During that week a series of events take place.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Devon
- Dorset
- Somerset
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 01 May 2012: Standard registration
- BRIDPORT LITERARY FESTIVAL LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Deirdre Coates | Chair | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Rock | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Child | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mary Laura Selina Rose Joly | Trustee | 29 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Irene Carless | Trustee | 29 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £95.70k | £31.53k | £97.23k | £115.08k | £114.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £78.57k | £49.99k | £87.13k | £98.70k | £125.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12 MAR 2012
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY PROMOTING AND PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR THE APPRECIATION, UNDERSTANDING AND ENJOYMENT OF LITERATURE AND THE ARTS AND, IN PARTICULAR, THROUGH THE PROMOTION AND RUNNING OF A LITERARY FESTIVAL IN BRIDPORT TO PROVIDE OPPORTUNITIES FOR THE GENERAL PUBLIC TO READ FOR PLEASURE AND TO INCREASE THEIR KNOWLEDGE, UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF ANY MATTERS LITERARY, HISTORIC, ARTISTIC, ARCHITECTURAL, AESTHETIC OR SCIENTIFIC INTEREST
Contact information
- Address:
-
157 Orchard Crescent
BRIDPORT
DT6 5HB
- Phone:
- 01308 426491
- Email:
- hello@bridlit.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window