CHURCHES TOGETHER IN CUMBRIA
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support close working of member churches, Local Ecumenical Partnerships/Churches Together groups. Facilitate meetings and conferences on variety of topics. Support emergency planning network and chaplains. Facilitate social issues projects. Continue to build partnerships with other organisations to ensure faith community participation in public issues. Monthly newsletter and web-site.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cumbria
Governance
- 26 June 2012: Standard registration
- 22 September 2020: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 22 September 2020: Funds transferred to 1191358 CHURCHES TOGETHER IN CUMBRIA
- CTIC (Working name)
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.17k | £44.37k | £47.64k | £50.92k | £48.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.76k | £54.32k | £49.50k | £33.47k | £49.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £1.00k | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 September 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 28 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | 28 October 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 17 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | 17 October 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 15 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | 31 October 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 OCT 2011
Charitable objects
3. AIMS AND OBJECTIVES: THE OBJECTIVE OF CHURCHES TOGETHER IN CUMBRIA SHALL BE THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION, THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND ANY OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES. IN PARTICULAR, CHURCHES TOGETHER IN CUMBRIA SHALL SEEK TO FURTHER THESE OBJECTS BY A. ENCOURAGING AND ENABLING CHURCHES IN THE COUNTY TO GROW TOGETHER IN TRUST AND MUTUAL ACCEPTANCE THROUGH SHARED WORSHIP, PRAYER, LEARNING, SERVICE AND EVANGELISM WITH EACH CHURCH SHARING WITH OTHERS THE TREASURES OF ITS TRADITION; B. ENCOURAGING AND STIMULATING THROUGHOUT THE COUNTY A DEEPER COMMITMENT TO CHRISTIAN UNITY; C. PROMOTING AND CO-ORDINATING ECUMENICAL STRATEGIES AT ALL LEVELS D. ACTING AS A SPONSORING BODY FOR LOCAL ECUMENICAL PARTNERSHIPS, ENSURING THE PROVISION OF APPROPRIATE ONGOING ADVICE AND SUPPORT, EQUITABLE FINANCIAL ASSESSMENT AND PROPER PERIODIC REVIEW; E. ENCOURAGING FULL AND EARLY ECUMENICAL CONSULTATION SO THAT THE CHURCHES MAY USE RESOURCES (INCLUDING BUILDINGS AND THE DEPLOYMENT OF PERSONNEL) WITH SENSITIVITY AND IN THE INTERESTS OF GOOD STEWARDSHIP; F. PROVIDING A MEETING POINT FOR CHRISTIAN LEADERS AND REPRESENTATIVES WITHIN THE COUNTY; G. KEEPING THE CHURCHES INFORMED ABOUT ECUMENICAL INITIATIVES BOTH INSIDE AND OUTSIDE THE COUNTY, LIAISING WITH THE NATIONAL ECUMENICAL BODIES; H. AND IN ALL THESE WAYS, PROVIDING A FOCUSED CHRISTIAN REFERENCE POINT FOR LOCAL GOVERNMENT AND OTHER SECULAR BODIES WITH WHOM CHURCHES TOGETHER IN CUMBRIA WILL SEEK TO WORK IN THE INTERESTS OF THE WELL-BEING OF THE PEOPLE OF CUMBRIA.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window