THE PORTRAIT TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHARITY PROMOTES AND ADVANCES LEARNING THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF PORTRAITS. DURING THE YEAR ENDED 31 MARCH, 2018 THE CHARITY MADE ONE GRANT TO THE NATIONAL PORTRAIT GALLERY FOR ITS CREATIVE CONNECTIONS PROJECT.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 September 2012: Standard registration
- 20 August 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 20 August 2021: Funds transferred to
- 23 August 2022: Funds received from 271235 MARK ARMITAGE CHARITABLE TRUST
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/05/2019 | 31/05/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.72k | £20.33k | £20.34k | £20.34k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.23k | £5.77k | £61.11k | £61.11k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 07 June 2021 | 68 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2019 | 07 June 2021 | 433 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 10 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29 MAR 2012
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE PUBLIC’S LEARNING THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF PORTRAITS, BY ANY CHARITABLE MEANS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION BY SUPPORT OF SUCH OF THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF THE NATIONAL PORTRAIT GALLERY AS THE TRUSTEES OF THE CHARITY SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window