Financial history PUDDLEDUCKS NURSERY & PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1147559
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £211.08k £228.28k £231.76k £284.83k £314.43k
Total expenditure £230.37k £238.32k £236.86k £268.90k £340.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £116.68k N/A N/A £98.11k