TEDDINGTON METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To proclaim the gospel in the Teddington Methodist Circuit; to express the love of Christ in word and deed in the neighbourhood and to support the Church worldwide.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

27 Trustee(s)
240 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Hounslow
- Richmond Upon Thames
- Surrey
Governance
- 10 October 2012: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
27 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Gilks | Trustee | 01 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard James Taylor | Trustee | 06 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jeffrey McQueen | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Vijay Christian | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Sam-Aggrey | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Axton | Trustee | 05 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Greasby | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Barbara Mary Spittle | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Philip Slater | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Errington-Rycroft | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Annette Christine Peddie | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Eunice Santos Gilks B.Ed | Trustee | 07 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gill Jackson | Trustee | 16 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sue Snelling | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev DAVID ANTHONY INNES | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|||||
Liz Windaybank | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN JACKSON OBEMSCMICE | Trustee | 25 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ian Denys Pegg Bsc FRICS | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT MORTIMER | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jill Fraser | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
SHARON BARBAREZ | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Frederick Amoasi | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth North | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Susan Dennison BSc, CIPFA | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Philip Coombes | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
ALFRED EVANS | Trustee | 09 October 2012 |
|
|||||
Grahame Snelling | Trustee | 01 September 2008 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £169.07k | £165.33k | £163.53k | £193.26k | £228.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £169.33k | £184.74k | £177.26k | £165.72k | £162.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 18 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 18 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 29 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 29 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 07 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 07 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 02 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 02 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) ADOPTED 20 SEP 1932
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDUARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Teddington Methodist Church
1 Stanley Road
Teddington
TW11 8TP
- Phone:
- 020 8973 1880
- Email:
- admin@tmcc.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window