BLESSED TO BE A BLESSING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
BTBAB provides Christians with an opportunity to go to the developing world serving alongside the poor using their skills. We invest in educational projects - that empower a person with skills or tools that enable them to be self-productive and long-term projects that transforms communities and reverse poverty, bringing skills and employment on a large scale that lasts for a minimum of 10yrs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Gwynedd
- Worcestershire
- Burundi
- Tanzania
- Thailand
- Vietnam
Governance
- 10 September 2012: Standard registration
- 29 October 2024: Funds received from 1140404 REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD-OPEN HEAVENS LOND...
- BTBAB (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thomas Nelson | Trustee | 12 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Cooper | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
JULIE ESSEKU | Trustee | 04 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Twum-Barima | Trustee | 04 July 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.90k | £16.28k | £16.82k | £11.94k | £8.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.13k | £15.10k | £17.81k | £10.55k | £5.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED AS AMENDED ON 04/08/2012 as amended on 20 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EVANGELICAL CHRISTIAN FAITH IN DEVELOPING COUNTRIES BY SUCH MEANS AS CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO PROMOTING EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS IN DEVELOPING COUNTRIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 3
88 Princes Road
LIVERPOOL
- Phone:
- 07752167912
- Email:
- INFO@BTBAB.ORG
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window