MELTON VINEYARD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MELTON VINEYARD IS A CHRISTIAN CHURCH, AFFILIATED TO VINEYARD CHURCHES UK AND A MEMBER OF CHURCHES TOGETHER IN MELTON. WE PROVIDE SERVICES OF WORSHIP AND TEACHING, OPPORTUNITIES TO LEARN ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, OUTREACH TO THE POOR AND DISADVANTAGED AT HOME AND ABROAD, WITH A PARTICULAR FOCUS ON SERVING THE COMMUNITY IN AND AROUND THE BOROUGH OF MELTON.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £41,000 from 4 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Leicestershire
- Rutland
- Honduras
Governance
- 16 May 2012: Standard registration
- 05 March 2013: Funds received from 1115761 MELTON VINEYARD
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jillyan Elizabeth Beadle | Chair | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Ann Stannard | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
George Cameron Stannard | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas George Gretton | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|||||
Steven James Cliff | Trustee | 15 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
BERNARD JAMES CARTER | Trustee | 15 May 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £381.81k | £303.62k | £296.14k | £351.65k | £340.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £236.39k | £261.89k | £272.52k | £364.46k | £327.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £70.98k | £21.18k | N/A | £4.00k | £41.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09 MAY 2012
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ('THE OBJECTS') ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND ARE RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: (A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN THE SCHEDULE TO THE ARTICLES HERETO ATTACHED INCLUDING BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION THROUGH THE PLANTING OF OTHER VINEYARD CHURCHES IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF MELTON MOWBRAY, THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; (B) TO FURTHER CHRISTIAN EDUCATION IN SUCH PARTS OF MELTON MOWBRAY, THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; (C) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING, TRAINING IN LIFE SKILLS AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF MELTON MOWBRAY, THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; (D) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HOPE CENTRE
42-44 NOTTINGHAM STREET
MELTON MOWBRAY
LEICESTERSHIRE
LE13 1NW
- Phone:
- 01664511021
- Email:
- info@meltonvineyard.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window