SPARK IN THE PARK (COVENTRY)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purpose of the charity is to advance the Christian faith in Coventry and surrounding area. We organise a family oriented event and activities at which the Christian message and teaching is shared, in August. This is a free event open to all, but aimed at children aged 5-11 years. In 2012 we had to cancel the event due to adverse weather.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 02 May 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Coventry City
Governance
- 11 September 2012: Standard registration
- 10 July 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
- 10 July 2023: Funds transferred to 1090102 COVENTRY CITY MISSION
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 02/05/2017 | 02/05/2018 | 02/05/2019 | 02/05/2020 | 02/05/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.63k | £16.08k | £17.34k | £7.99k | £1.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.18k | £12.80k | £14.45k | £14.21k | £2.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 02 May 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 02 May 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 02 May 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 02 May 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 02 May 2021 | 17 March 2022 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 02 May 2020 | 02 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 13/05/2012
Charitable objects
(I)THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY (THE 'OBJECTS') ARE TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN COVENTRY AND SURROUNDING AREA IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES, PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICES OF THE PARTICIPATING CHRISTIAN CHURCHES. (II)THE CHARITY WILL ACHIEVE ITS OBJECTS BY, INTER ALIA:- (A)ORGANISING FAMILY ORIENTATED EVENTS AND ACTIVITIES AT WHICH THE CHRISTIAN MESSAGE AND TEACHING WILL BE SHARED; (B)HOLDING OF A WIDE RANGE ACTIVITIES, PRAYER MEETINGS, SERVICES OF WORSHIP, PUBLIC CELEBRATIONS OF CHRISTIAN FESTIVALS, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING MEDIA ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN FAITH TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION; AND (C)SUCH OTHER ACTIVITIES THAT THE TRUSTEES CONSIDER WILL ACHIEVE THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window