Financial history St Joseph's Convent Secondary School Ex Pupil's Association

Charity Number: 1149886
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £34.51k £15.64k £22.00k £20.14k £46.98k
Total expenditure £28.17k £10.90k £43.91k £13.92k £31.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A