Financial history YOUNG CARERS DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity number: 1150197
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £85.32k £151.46k £143.20k £196.54k £333.53k
Total expenditure £78.15k £119.91k £142.34k £187.24k £212.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A