Accounts and annual returns THE YOUNGS COMMUNITY SPORTS TRUST

Charity number: 1151065
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 01 April 2025 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 01 April 2025 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2023 23 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 23 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2022 20 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 20 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 21 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 23 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 05 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 05 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window