UKPIPS LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide information and support for patients and their carers, partners and family with a Primary Antibody Deficiency and other Primary Immune Deficiencies, residing permanently or temporarily in the United Kingdom. Educate the general public and medical community in all areas relating to a Primary Antibody Deficiency and other Primary Immune deficiencies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 03 September 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
judith lindsey gower | Trustee | 24 February 2024 |
|
|||||
andrew edward morris | Trustee | 24 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gary Richard Narborough | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Cohen | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jane Dimmock | Trustee | 10 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.61k | £18.72k | £8.62k | £12.16k | £8.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.74k | £13.49k | £15.11k | £12.13k | £10.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 10 January 2024 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 18 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 18 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25/05/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/08/2012
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF SUFFERERS OF PRIMARY ANTIBODY DEFICIENCY AND OTHER PRIMARY IMMUNE DEFICIENCIES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO PRIMARY ANTIBODY DEFICIENCY AND OTHER PRIMARY IMMUNE DEFICIENCIES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Marine House
151 Western Road
HAYWARDS HEATH
West Sussex
RH16 3LH
- Phone:
- 07531076409
- Email:
- dave.mcnally@ukpips.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window