ROYAL INTERNATIONAL AIR TATTOO FLYING SCHOLARSHIPS FOR DISABLED PEOPLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve the condition of and improve the quality of life of disabled people by means of offering scholarships to learn to fly aircraft and to promote and facilitate the flying of aircraft by disabled people. Thereby assisting them to realise and achieve their potential.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 29 June 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tiina Maria Conacher | Trustee | 09 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sqn Ldr Oliver Thornton | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Ager | Trustee | 23 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Cann | Trustee | 28 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Bird | Trustee | 17 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Webb | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susie Oakley | Trustee | 23 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Edward Krol | Trustee | 17 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adam Collins | Trustee | 17 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Angus Edgar Hickish | Trustee | 17 February 2022 |
|
|||||
John Ludovic Sorsby | Trustee | 10 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Giddings | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ian Revell | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Greenwood | Trustee | 19 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £160.07k | £47.36k | £139.11k | £148.23k | £171.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £136.55k | £39.16k | £139.20k | £168.98k | £164.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 08 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 08 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 02 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 02 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 13 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 13 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20 JUN 2012 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 17/08/2012
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE CONDITION OF AND IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF LIFE OF DISABLED PEOPLE. DISABLED PEOPLE MEANS PERSONS WHO ARE PHYSICALLY DISABLED OR HANDICAPPED OR OTHERWISE IMPEDED FOR ANY MEDICAL REASON FROM LEADING A NORMAL LIFE. IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS THE CHARITY WILL IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY (I) ENCOURAGE DISABLED PEOPLE TO LEARN TO FLY AIRCRAFT AND TO PROMOTE AND FACILITATE THE FLYING OF AIRCRAFT BY DISABLED PEOPLE (II) GRANT SCHOLARSHIPS TO BE KNOWN AS 'ROYAL INTERNATIONAL AIR TATTOO FLYING SCHOLARSHIPS FOR DISABLED PEOPLE' TO ENABLE DISABLED PEOPLE TO ATTEND TRAINING COURSES IN CONNECTION WITH THE FLYING OF AIRCRAFT IN MEMORY OF GROUP CAPTAIN SIR DOUGLAS BADER CBE DSO* DFC*
Linked charities
- 29 June 1998 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
FSDP
Douglas Bader House
Horcott Hill
FAIRFORD
- Phone:
- 01285 713299
- Email:
- info@fsdp.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window