Vineyard Bath

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Christian faith and education, the relief of sickness and financial hardship and preserve good health by the provision of funds, goods or services of any kind and providing assistance in social welfare.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bath And North East Somerset
Governance
- 15 August 2012: Standard registration
- BATH AND AVON VINEYARD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claire Louise Tomkins | Chair | 15 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM WOODWARD | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|||||
PETER FORBES MELVILLE STURROCK | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £258.68k | £275.38k | £231.81k | £246.77k | £261.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £285.23k | £248.02k | £208.93k | £273.38k | £251.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 10 September 2024 | 102 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 10 September 2024 | 102 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 10 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 10 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 15 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 15 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 19 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 19 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04 JUL 2012 as amended on 20 Dec 2018
Charitable objects
THE CHARITYS OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND ARE RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: (A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN THE SCHEDULE TO THE ARTICLES HERETO ATTACHED INCLUDING BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION THROUGH THE PLANTING OF OTHER VINEYARD CHURCHES IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF BATH AND SURROUNDING AREAS, THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; (B) TO FURTHER CHRISTIAN EDUCATION IN SUCH PARTS OF BATH AND SURROUNDING AREAS, THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; (C) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING, TRAINING IN LIFE SKILLS AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF BATH AND SURROUNDING AREAS, THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; (D) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
71-75 Shelton St
Covent Garden
London
WC2H 9JQ
- Phone:
- 01225464508
- Email:
- trustees@vineyardbath.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window