HARRIS (BELMONT) CHARITY

Charity number: 1149240
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The preservation, maintenance and upkeep (of the mansion house known as Belmont House) for the benefit of the public of property of historic architectural or artistic importance or beauty and the making of the same available for the education, enjoyment and benefit of the public.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 July 1997: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nick Baveystock Trustee 25 January 2025
THE ROCHESTER CATHEDRAL TRUST
Received: On time
John Stainton Trustee 15 October 2020
None on record
Andrew John Shirley Ross Trustee 12 July 2018
ST RONAN'S SCHOOL (HAWKHURST)
Received: On time
Dominic Michael Del Mar Trustee 04 April 2018
FRIENDS OF ST LAWRENCE
Received: On time
Vicki Jessel Trustee 15 November 2017
None on record
LORD ALASTAIR CAMPBELL COLGRAIN Trustee 10 September 2012
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.67m £1.23m £1.55m £1.99m £1.75m
Total expenditure £1.43m £1.37m £1.59m £1.76m £1.91m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £23.91k £10.52k £32.23k £9.45k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £1.06m £687.55k £991.37k £1.33m £959.30k
Income - Charitable activities £56.17k £17.57k £64.44k £95.10k £117.62k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £550.00k £503.53k £487.33k £531.90k £665.31k
Income - Other £0 £23.91k £10.52k £32.23k £9.45k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £647.92k £741.45k £838.17k £818.18k £983.41k
Expenditure - Raising funds £779.80k £630.79k £754.14k £942.26k £925.60k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £34.35k £61.67k £69.38k £57.81k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £34.91k £44.03k £38.05k £36.88k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £21.29m £22.10m £23.72m £23.75m £24.33m
Long-term investments £21.95m £24.86m £26.81m £25.78m £26.14m
Other assets £1.49m £1.23m £1.15m £1.47m £1.01m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £222.72k £156.34k £245.11k £348.25k £144.50k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 26 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 26 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 09 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 09 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 09 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 09 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 21 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 21 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 20 JUNE 1980 AS AMENDED BY ORDER OF 3 MAY 2006 AND RESOLUTION DATED 15 MARCH 2007.
Charitable objects
1. THE PRESERVATION AND MAINTENANCE OF, AND PROVISION OF PUBLIC ACCESS TO BELMONT HOUSE, FAVERSHAM, KENT TOGETHER WITH ITS CONTENTS AND SURROUNDING LAND, AND ANY OTHER PROPERTY AND ASSETS OF ARCHITECTURAL, HISTORICAL OR ARTISTIC IMPORTANCE OR BEAUTY, FOR THE EDUCATION, ENJOYMENT AND BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC; 2. NOTWITHSTANDING THE DIRECTORS' ABSOLUTE DISCRETION OR OTHERWISE, THE DIRECTORS SHOULD ENDEAVOUR TO PRESERVE BELMONT HOUSE AND ITS CONTENTS AND SURROUNDING LAND; 3. THE PROMOTION OF SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE DIRECTORS DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Registration history
  • 16 July 1997 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
Clarke & Simpson
Well Close Square
Framlingham
WOODBRIDGE
Suffolk
IP13 9DU
Phone:
01728 724200