KINGSWOOD TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Kingswood offers outdoor and environmental learning opportunities for children, young people, families, educators and the local community. The 9 acre site offers residential facilities, day visits and activities to support learning, personal development, health and wellbeing. Kingswood has an enviable local reputation as a Centre of Excellence for its outdoor and environmental provision.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
126 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Shropshire
- Staffordshire
- Telford & Wrekin
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 09 November 2012: Standard registration
- KINGSWOOD NIC TRUST (Working name)
- KINGSWOOD NURSERY AND INFANT CENTRE TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MAJOR DAVID HARRIS BEd HonsTD | Chair | 10 September 2012 |
|
|||||
Caroline Jennifer Short | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
REBECCA MARY HARLEY | Trustee | 27 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
GARY GENTLE | Trustee | 27 June 2018 |
|
|||||
PHILIP PAGE | Trustee | 27 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
RUSSELL THOMPSON | Trustee | 27 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN SHANKS BSc Hons | Trustee | 10 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN LACEY BED NPQH | Trustee | 10 September 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £284.11k | £253.44k | £416.23k | £431.97k | £388.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £314.12k | £253.37k | £408.00k | £429.04k | £417.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £89.14k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19 JUL 2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 05/03/2013
Charitable objects
4.1.1. TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF ALL CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND THE COMMUNITY, THROUGH HIGH QUALITY OUTDOOR LEARNING AND ENVIRONMENTAL EXPERIENCES. IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE TAILORED LEARNING OUTSIDE THE CLASSROOM OPPORTUNITIES, INCLUDING DAY AND RESIDENTIAL VISITS FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION. 4.1.2. TO ENCOURAGE CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND THE WIDER COMMUNITY TO PLAY AN ACTIVE PART IN THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF BOTH THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENTS. TO INCREASE THE BIODIVERSITY OF THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT, ENCOURAGING PARTICIPATION, RESPECT AND ENJOYMENT. THE IMPACT OF THIS WILL PROVIDE BENEFITS FOR ALL. 4.1.3. TO PROMOTE EDUCATION FOR SUSTAINABILITY, WITH CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND THE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATING IN DEVELOPMENTS AND ACTIVITIES WHICH ARE ABOUT LIVING TODAY WITH TOMORROW IN MIND. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS ARTICLE 4.1.3, ?SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT? MEANS DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS). 4.1.4 TO ASSIST IN THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY/FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN WOLVERHAMPTON AND THE LOCAL AREA BY PROVIDING OUTDOOR EDUCATION OPPORTUNITIES FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WHICH ARE APPROPRIATE AND MEET THE NEEDS OF INDIVIDUALS OR GROUPS. 4.1.5. TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION AND EQUALITY OF OPPORTUNITY FOR ALL CHILDREN. YOUNG PEOPLE AND THE COMMUNITY IN OUTDOOR AND ENVIRONMENTAL LEARNING OPPORTUNITIES, IRRESPECTIVE OF DISABILITY, HERITAGE, SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL NEEDS, SOCIAL GROUP, GENDER, PHYSICAL OR EMOTIONAL NEEDS, RACE OR CULTURE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Kingswood Trust
Holyhead Road
Albrighton
Kingswood
WOLVERHAMPTON
WV7 3AP
- Phone:
- 01902 558132
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window