Accounts and annual returns WEST MIDLANDS WINTER SPORTS CLUB LIMITED

Charity number: 1149484
Charity reporting is overdue by 1103 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 7 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 7 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 372 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 372 days
Annual return 30 June 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 738 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 738 days
Annual return 30 June 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1103 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1103 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 02 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window