THE DAUGHTERS OF CHARITY OF ST. VINCENT DE PAUL SERVICES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
DCSVP Services is an organisation to safeguard and deepen the Vincentian character and value of the Daughters of Charity of St Vincent de Paul's Projects and Services. Its Principal aims is to assist in planning for long tem sustainability, and assist with infrastructural needs and best practice in governance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Barnet
- City Of Westminster
- Scotland
Governance
- 16 October 2012: Standard registration
- DCSVP SERVICES (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sister Kathleen Page | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Sr Margaret Barrett | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Louisa Collyer-Hamlin | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Gareth Rowe | Trustee | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Kathleen Hogg | Trustee | 24 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
James O'Connor | Trustee | 07 December 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Sister Sarah King-Turner | Trustee | 09 December 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
SISTER MOIRA THERESA BAIN | Trustee | 04 October 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
Sister Theresa Tighe | Trustee | 04 October 2014 |
|
|||||||||
Rev Paul ROCHE | Trustee | 02 September 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
Sister Ellen Teresa Flynn DC | Trustee | 20 September 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.93m | £9.52m | £17.07m | £2.85m | £289.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.60m | £8.06m | £14.68m | £336.59k | £421.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £694.61k | £1.92m | £3.37m | £2.73m | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £7.17m | £7.44m | £13.37m | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £60.27k | £56.17k | £54.89k | £119.91k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £6.03k | £99.73k | £275.73k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £2.00k | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £7.60m | £8.06m | £14.67m | £313.60k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £13.08k | £22.99k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £36.63k | £41.34k | £63.19k | £23.68k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £13.08k | £22.99k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17 MAY 2011 as amended on 09 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
IN THE SPIRIT OF ST. VINCENT DE PAUL THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS SHALL ADVANCE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CONGREGATION ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES WITH THE APPROVAL OF THE PROVINCIAL SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT, PROVIDED THAT IF AT ANY TIME THE CONGREGATION SHALL CEASE TO EXIST OR SHALL CEASE TO CARRY ON ANY CHARITABLE WORK THEN FOR SUCH OTHER LAWFUL PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH SIMILAR CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Daughters Of Charity Of St. Vincent De Paul
St. Vincents Centre
Carlisle Place
LONDON
SW1P 1NL
- Phone:
- 07734395399
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window