THE OPEN SCHOOL FOR ARABIC AND ISLAMIC STUDIES (OSAIS)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
OSAIS has hosted a number of social events including barbeques and ?Eid gatherings. Other events are linked to educational courses such as the ST (Student Teachers) Inset and the General Shoora (OSAIS AGM) which is a chance for students to meet as well as to discuss OSAIS related issues and training. OSAIS have also been involved in planning trips to Mecca for Umrah which took place in April 2015.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Manchester City
Governance
- 21 October 2013: Standard registration
- OSAIS (Working name)
- THE OPEN SCHOOL FOR ARABIC AND ISLAMIC STUDIES (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ammar Yasir Rahman | Trustee | 05 August 2021 |
|
|||||
Anbareen Tanwir | Trustee | 05 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Noorjahan Begum | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Hafsa Khatun | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Shila Begum | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mushtaq Dakri | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Imran Ayub Maljee | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sidrah Shehzadi Bhutta | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
DR Mohammed Mustafa | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Ishaq | Trustee | 10 April 2015 |
|
|||||
Dr Hassan Awan | Trustee | 10 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rabina Chowdhury | Trustee | 21 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
Yahya Goga | Trustee | 18 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
ARIFA BEGUM | Trustee | 18 March 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £59.91k | £66.49k | £36.81k | £53.53k | £49.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.76k | £40.22k | £41.49k | £46.93k | £54.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01 MAR 2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 27/07/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 22/07/2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC FAITH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY A) THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A BUILDING USED FOR ISLAMIC WORSHIP; B) ENGAGING IN INTER-FAITH ACTIVITIES,AND C) PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE PROVISION OF ISLAMIC EDUCATION IN MANCHESTER UK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
532 Stretford Road
Old Trafford
Manchester
M16 9AF
- Phone:
- 07934500569
- Email:
- theopenschool@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window