Trustees THE OPEN SCHOOL FOR ARABIC AND ISLAMIC STUDIES (OSAIS)
Charity Number: 1154279

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Abdul Hamid Mulla | Trustee | 09 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anbareen Tanwir | Trustee | 05 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ammar Yasir Rahman | Trustee | 05 August 2021 |
|
|||||
Hafsa Khatun | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Shila Begum | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
DR Mohammed Mustafa | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Hassan Awan | Trustee | 10 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rabina Chowdhury | Trustee | 21 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
ARIFA BEGUM | Trustee | 18 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Yahya Goga | Trustee | 18 March 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.