ST MUNGO COMMUNITY HOUSING ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
St Mungo's began helping people sleeping rough off the streets of London in 1969. Over the years we have extended our work beyond emergency help, to prevention of homelessness and promotion of recovery. We now help thousands of people across the South of England rebuild their lives day by day through housing, health and skills initiatives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£123,671,980
Donations and legacies | £13.51m | |
Charitable activities | £110.15m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £3.91k |
Total expenditure:
£126,739,700
Raising funds | £4.94m | |
Charitable activities | £121.80m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £61,418,845 from 147 government contract(s) and £1,203,042 from 4 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £4.94m | |
Charitable expenditure | £121.80m |
People

1699 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
450 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 27 |
£70k to £80k | 15 |
£80k to £90k | 2 |
£90k to £100k | 4 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
£120k to £130k | 1 |
£130k to £140k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- ST MUNGOS (Working name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Homes England
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael John Adamson | Chair | 02 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip Wynford Moore | Trustee | 26 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Ann Rose Mealings | Trustee | 26 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert James Bradshaw | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Darren Michael Johnson | Trustee | 25 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Shingirai Thaddeus Nyahasha | Trustee | 25 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Watts | Trustee | 25 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Beidas | Trustee | 21 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Corry Richard | Trustee | 21 March 2017 |
|
|||||
Helen Walters | Trustee | 17 November 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £106.99m | £122.05m | £118.70m | £122.99m | £123.67m | |
|
Total expenditure | £108.79m | £123.18m | £118.80m | £126.24m | £126.74m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £43.30m | £56.00m | £54.56m | £59.73m | £61.42m | |
|
Income from government grants | £52.75k | £899.07k | £2.08m | £713.00k | £1.20m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £12.55m | £16.08m | £12.94m | £16.50m | £13.51m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £94.32m | £105.92m | £105.74m | £106.34m | £110.15m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £118.00k | £41.00k | £21.00k | £145.00k | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £3.91k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £2.79m | £0 | £0 | £1.82m | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £105.48m | £119.46m | £114.91m | £121.34m | £121.80m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £3.31m | £3.73m | £3.89m | £4.90m | £4.94m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £84.07m | £84.22m | £83.67m | £84.43m | £82.96m | |
|
Long-term investments | £68.00k | £25.00k | £17.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £37.72m | £41.82m | £42.14m | £35.31m | £25.98m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£10.14m | -£10.58m | -£8.13m | -£6.31m | -£7.69m | |
|
Total liabilities | £95.21m | £101.77m | £102.93m | £101.02m | £94.11m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24/09/2012
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION (THE “OBJECTS”) ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT:- THE PROVISION OF TEMPORARY AND PERMANENT HOUSING, AND OF SUPPORT AND CARE, FOR THE RELIEF OF POOR, AGED, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED OR CHRONICALLY SICK PEOPLE; AND OF SERVICES WHICH PREVENT PEOPLE FROM BECOMING HOMELESS, WHICH ALLEVIATE HOMELESSNESS AND WHICH ASSIST PEOPLE TO RECOVER FROM HOMELESSNESS. ANY OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND & WALES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE PROVIDED SUCH PURPOSE CAN BE CARRIED OUT BY A CHARITY REGISTERED AS A PROVIDER OF SOCIAL HOUSING WITH THE REGULATOR.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Mungo's
5th Floor
3 Thomas More Square
London
E1W 1YW
- Phone:
- 02038566168
- Email:
- Info@mungos.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window