BELCEA CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust awards money to composers who compose works for the Belcea Quartet to perform internationally. The Trust also awards money to Belcea Quartet members who mentor younger upcoming chamber groups in intensive coaching sessions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 December 2012: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT BOAS | Chair | 09 November 2012 |
|
|||||
Jason Thomas Price | Trustee | 03 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM NICHOLSON | Trustee | 27 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sally Walton | Trustee | 14 December 2015 |
|
|||||
Jennifer Susan Jonas | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|||||
SIR JOHN TUSA | Trustee | 09 November 2012 |
|
|||||
DAME JANET RITTERMAN DBE | Trustee | 09 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
SABINE VINCK | Trustee | 09 November 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.77k | £3.17k | £850 | £1.03k | £800 | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.35k | £2.96k | £90 | £2.03k | £2.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28 JUL 2011 as amended on 20 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP, MAINTAIN AND ADVANCE EDUCATION AND THE ARTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE PROMOTION, SUPPORT, AND ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ART OF MUSIC AND ALL OTHER ART FORMS AND SPECIFICALLY WITHOUT LIMITATION THE MUSIC OF THE BELCEA QUARTET BY THE PRESENTATION OF PERFORMANCES, MASTERCLASSES AND RECORDINGS 2) TO BENEFIT ANY CHARITY OR FURTHER ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE AS TO THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT
Contact information
- Address:
-
48 Carrington Crescent
Wendover
Aylesbury
HP22 6AN
- Phone:
- 07812984236
- Email:
- friends@belceaquartet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window