THE DANNY GREEN FUND CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide funding or equipment to assist rehabilitation of children suffering from Posterior Fossa Syndrome as the result of a brain tumour. We raise funds to increase brain tumour awareness & funding for brain tumour research, We also provide gifts for children staying on the Oncology ward at Great Ormond Street Hospital at Christmas & provide play equipment for children in local hospitals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 07 October 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- THE DANNY GREEN CHARITY (Working name)
- THE DANNY GREEN FUND (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTOPHER GREEN | Chair | 29 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN SMITH | Trustee | 23 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Ritchie Coleman | Trustee | 21 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
LISA JOSEPH | Trustee | 13 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
LISA GREEN | Trustee | 13 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
ALAN MAY | Trustee | 13 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOANNE MATTEWS | Trustee | 13 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
KIMBERLY WELLINGTON | Trustee | 13 November 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 07/10/2020 | 07/10/2021 | 07/10/2022 | 07/10/2023 | 07/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.21k | £37.57k | £73.21k | £50.48k | £142.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.38k | £43.79k | £55.13k | £52.13k | £66.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 07 October 2024 | 02 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 October 2024 | 02 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 07 October 2023 | 18 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 October 2023 | 18 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 07 October 2022 | 15 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 October 2022 | 15 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 07 October 2021 | 09 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 October 2021 | 09 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 07 October 2020 | 01 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 October 2020 | 01 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07 OCT 2012 AS AMENDED ON 02/01/2013
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND PROMOTION OF THE HEALTH OF CHILDREN SUFFERING WITH BRAIN TUMOURS, PARTICULARLY POSTERIOR FOSSA SYNDROME (PFS); IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY: 1.PROMOTING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE SIGNS & SYMPTOMS OF BRAIN TUMOURS IN CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE 2.PROVIDING FUNDING FOR THE DEVELOPMENT OF RESEARCH INTO PRACTICAL APPLICATIONS FOR THE PREVENTION, TREATMENT AND CURE OF CHILDREN’S’ BRAIN CANCER. 3. THE PROVISION OF PLAY EQUIPMENT AND GIFTS WHERE APPROPRIATE FOR CHILDREN WHO ARE REQUIRED TO SPEND TIME IN AN ONCOLOGY WARD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
35 Hallet Road
Canvey Island
SS8 8LH
- Phone:
- 01268513064
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window