THE CREATIVE ARTS RETREAT MOVEMENT

Charity number: 1149636
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Providing and training leaders for about 30 retreats, mainly in England

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020

Total income: £4,390
Total expenditure: £2,823

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 November 2012: Standard registration
  • 07 July 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
  • 07 July 2022: Funds transferred to 1150792 THE RETREAT ASSOCIATION
  • 07 July 2022: Funds transferred to 1129831 CHRISTIAN CREATIVITY LTD
  • 07 July 2022: Funds transferred to 269866 QUIET WATERS CHRISTIAN RETREAT HOUSE
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • CARM (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £10.60k £9.70k £8.31k £8.01k £4.39k
Total expenditure £10.87k £10.92k £7.41k £6.73k £2.82k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 07 April 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required