THE KANIKI TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising, (mainly in the United Kingdom) to support the establishing and operation of 1. Kapumpe Christian Primary School, nr. Ndola, Zambia. 2. Kaniki Bible University College, nr. Ndola, Zambia 3. Supporting Kaniki Orphans Project (also called 'Arise' ) Operating the UK Bank account (The Kaniki Trust) Forwarding funds to appropriate accounts in Zambia and in the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Zambia
Governance
- 15 November 2012: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Frances Pons | Chair | 25 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Ruth Elliott | Trustee | 25 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Tim Mills | Trustee | 15 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Mills | Trustee | 15 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Nigel A Crowther | Trustee | 15 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
SIMON PONS | Trustee | 05 November 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.27k | £37.73k | £59.76k | £32.61k | £35.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.20k | £31.40k | £80.39k | £29.10k | £44.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 06 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10 OCT 2012
Charitable objects
1.TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF STUDENTS AT KANIKI BIBLE UNIVERSITY COLLEGE AND THE PUPILS AT KAPUMPE CHRISTIAN PRIMARY SCHOOL OF NDOLA, ZAMBIA, BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE COLLEGE AND SCHOOL. 2.TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE COLLEGE'S MISSION STATEMENT APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE.3.THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, OF PEOPLE LIVING IN ZAMBIA, BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY AND PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES INCLUDING TRANSPORT COSTS.
Area of benefit
ZAMBIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 NOBURY HILL
INKBERROW
WORCESTER
WR7 4HA
- Phone:
- 01386793530
- Email:
- frances@ponsy.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window